Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/11/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 03/31/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/22/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/22/2003