Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 11/05/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/06/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/11/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/30/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/15/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/20/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/20/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/21/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/07/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/07/2004