Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 10/28/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 10/28/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/03/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/24/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/10/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/10/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/10/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/16/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/23/2004