There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Marine Turtle Conservation Act of 2004

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Marine Turtle Conservation Act of 2004

Short Titles as Reported to House

Marine Turtle Conservation Act of 2003

Short Titles as Introduced

Marine Turtle Conservation Act of 2003

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Marine Turtle Conservation Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To assist in the conservation of marine turtles and the nesting habitats of marine turtles in foreign countries.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
07/02/2004Became Public Law No: 108-266. (TXT | PDF)
07/02/2004Signed by President.
06/23/2004Presented to President.
06/18/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7058)
06/14/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3878-3879)
05/20/2004Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 108-507.
10/28/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
07/02/2004Became Public Law No: 108-266. (TXT | PDF)
07/02/2004Signed by President.
06/23/2004HousePresented to President.
06/18/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/18/2004SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7058)
06/15/2004SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
06/14/2004-2:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/14/2004-2:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3878-3879)
06/14/2004-2:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3378.
06/14/2004-2:11pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3878-3880)
06/14/2004-2:10pmHouseMr. Renzi moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/20/2004HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 290.
05/20/2004HouseReported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 108-507.
05/05/2004HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
05/05/2004HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/22/2004HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans
04/22/2004HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans
03/25/2004HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans
11/07/2003HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
11/07/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Resources
10/28/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
10/28/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/20/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/21/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/11/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/11/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/11/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/24/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/24/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/09/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/23/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/31/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/31/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/31/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/21/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/21/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/21/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/21/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/21/2004
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/21/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/21/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/22/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/22/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/22/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/22/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/22/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/22/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/05/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/05/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/11/2004
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/11/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/11/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources10/28/2003 Referred to
05/05/2004 Markup by
05/20/2004 Reported by H. Rept. 108-507
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans11/07/2003 Referred to
03/25/2004 Hearings by
04/22/2004 Markup by
04/22/2004 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.3378. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-266 (07/02/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on June 14, 2004. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Marine Turtle Conservation Act of 2004 - (Sec. 4) Directs the Secretary of the Interior to use amounts in the Multinational Species Conservation Fund to finance projects for the conservation of marine turtles and their nesting habitats in foreign countries.

Authorizes the Secretary to approve projects that help recover and sustain viable populations of marine turtles in the wild by assisting conservation programs in foreign countries. Gives preference to projects which: (1) are designed for long-term conservation of marine turtles and their nesting habitats; and (2) have matching funds available.

(Sec. 5) Establishes the Marine Turtle Conservation Fund as a separate account in the Multinational Species Conservation Fund.

(Sec. 6) Authorizes the Secretary to convene an advisory group of individuals representing public and private organizations actively involved in the conservation of marine turtles.

(Sec. 7) Authorizes appropriations for FY 2005 through 2009.

(Sec. 8) Directs the Secretary to report to Congress on the results and effectiveness of the program carried out under this Act.