Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/20/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/21/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/11/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/11/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/11/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/24/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/24/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/09/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/23/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/31/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/31/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/31/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/21/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/21/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/21/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/21/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/21/2004
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/21/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/21/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/22/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/22/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/22/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/22/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/22/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/22/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/05/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/05/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/11/2004
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/11/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/11/2004