There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Health Programs Improvement Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve health care programs of the Department of Veterans Affairs and to extend certain expiring authorities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/29/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
12/06/2003-See Public Law 108-170.
11/19/2003-Similar provision incorporated. See S. 1156, Title I, Section 104, and Title IV, Sections 404 and 405.
11/13/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/30/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2158-2159)
Action By: House of Representatives
10/29/2003Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/29/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/30/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/04/2003

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs10/29/2003 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health11/13/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3387. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/29/2003)

Veterans Health Programs Improvement Act of 2003 - Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to furnish care to a newborn child of a veteran who is receiving maternity care furnished through the Department of Veterans Affairs for up to 14 days after the birth of the child if the veteran delivered the child in a Department facility or a non-Department facility under a Department contract for delivery services.

Repeals a provision which excludes certain vocational rehabilitation services from those authorized to be provided to ill or disabled veterans. Authorizes the Secretary to furnish: (1) work skills training and development services; (2) employment support services; and (3) job development and placement services.

Extends through 2008 Department authority to provide specialized hospital, medical, and nursing home care to: (1) Vietnam-era herbicide-exposed veterans; and (2) Persian Gulf War veterans.

Requires an individual applying for any medical care through the Department to furnish the Secretary with information on any health-plan contract under which such individual is covered. Authorizes the Secretary to deny any application not containing such information.

Extends through: (1) 2008 Department authority to lease to nonprofit organizations or States real property on which veterans have defaulted on Department-guaranteed loans; (2) 2009 certain annual reports; and (3) 2008 the provision of readjustment counseling for Vietnam-era veterans.

Makes permanent (currently expires December 31, 2004) Department authority to provide sexual trauma counseling to veterans.