Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/04/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/04/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 11/17/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/17/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/17/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/05/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/05/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/19/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/18/2004