Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/28/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/28/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 01/28/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/28/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 01/28/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/28/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/28/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/04/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/04/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/04/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/04/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/04/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/04/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/04/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/04/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/11/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/11/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/11/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/13/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/26/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/26/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/26/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/26/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/26/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/26/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/26/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/27/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/05/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/05/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/18/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/19/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/19/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/19/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/25/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/03/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/03/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/01/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/13/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/18/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/18/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/23/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/14/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/18/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/18/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/23/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/23/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/04/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/15/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/16/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/17/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/17/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/17/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/17/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/17/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 09/17/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/17/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/17/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/23/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/25/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/25/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/25/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/25/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/25/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/08/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/08/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/20/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/24/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/18/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 02/25/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 02/26/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/01/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/01/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/04/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/04/2004