There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Energy and Science Research Investment Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize appropriations for fiscal years 2004, 2005, 2006, and 2007 for the Department of Energy Office of Science, to ensure that the United States is the world leader in key scientific fields by restoring a healthy balance of science funding, to ensure maximum utilization of the national user facilities, and to secure the Nation's supply of scientists for the 21st century, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/07/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/20/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Science
01/07/2003Referred to the House Committee on Science.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (94)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/07/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/07/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 01/08/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/08/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/08/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/31/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/31/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 01/31/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/31/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/31/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/31/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/31/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/31/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 01/31/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/31/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/31/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/31/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/31/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/31/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/31/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 01/31/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/31/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/31/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/31/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 01/31/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 01/31/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/31/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/25/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/25/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/25/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/25/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/12/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/27/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/27/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/27/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/27/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/27/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/27/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/07/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/07/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/29/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 10/17/2003

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science01/07/2003 Referred to
House Science Subcommittee on Energy02/20/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.34.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.34. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/07/2003)

Energy and Science Research Investment Act of 2003 - Instructs the Secretary of Energy to: (1) conduct a comprehensive fundamental research program in designated sciences; and (2) upgrade and expand scientific user facilities maintained by the Office of Science in order to ensure that fundamental science programs aid the applied research and development programs of the Department of Energy (DOE).

Authorizes appropriations for FY 2004 through 2007.

Amends the Department of Energy Organization Act to establish within DOE: (1) an Under Secretary for Energy Research and Science, to serve as the Science and Technology Advisor to the Secretary, and to exercise authority and responsibility over Assistant Secretaries implementing energy research and development, and energy technology functions; (2) an Assistant Secretary of Science to head the Office of Science (currently headed by a Director); (3) an additional position for Assistant Secretary; (4) the position of General Counsel; and (5) a Science Advisory Board composed of the chairs of the advisory panels for each of the programs.