Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/07/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/07/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 01/08/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/08/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/08/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/31/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/31/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 01/31/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/31/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/31/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/31/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/31/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/31/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 01/31/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/31/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/31/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/31/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/31/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/31/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/31/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 01/31/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/31/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/31/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/31/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 01/31/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 01/31/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/31/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/25/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/25/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/25/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/25/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/12/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/27/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/27/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/27/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/27/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/27/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/27/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/07/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/07/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/29/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 10/17/2003