Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 10/29/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/05/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 11/18/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/18/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/18/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/19/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/08/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 01/27/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 02/26/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/26/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/03/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/10/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/10/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/16/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/16/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/23/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/23/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/23/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/22/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/29/2004