Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/18/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/18/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/18/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 01/21/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/21/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/28/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/28/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/04/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/26/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/26/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/26/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/25/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/25/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/02/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/07/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/07/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/07/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/07/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/07/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/07/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/07/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/22/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/17/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/17/2004