Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 10/30/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 10/30/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/04/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/04/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/04/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/05/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/07/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/07/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/07/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/07/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/07/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/07/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/07/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/07/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/07/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/17/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/17/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/17/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/17/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/17/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/18/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/08/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/08/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/20/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/20/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/11/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/03/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/03/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/04/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/10/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/18/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/23/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/23/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/29/2004