Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/30/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/30/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 10/30/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/30/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/04/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/04/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/04/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/04/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/07/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/07/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/17/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/17/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/17/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/17/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 11/17/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/19/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/21/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 12/08/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/20/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 01/20/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/20/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/27/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/27/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/27/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/27/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/03/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/10/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/24/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/24/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/24/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 02/24/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/31/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/05/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/11/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/11/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/11/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/24/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/12/2004