Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 11/04/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/04/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/04/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 11/04/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 11/04/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/10/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/10/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/10/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/10/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/10/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/20/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/08/2004