Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/21/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/21/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/08/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/08/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/08/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/08/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/21/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/21/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 01/21/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/21/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/21/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/21/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/21/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/21/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/21/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/21/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/21/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/21/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/21/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/21/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/21/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/04/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/04/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/04/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/04/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/04/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/26/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/26/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/26/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/26/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/26/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/04/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/04/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/04/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/04/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/04/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/11/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/11/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/11/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/17/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/17/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/17/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/17/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/17/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/17/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/17/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/17/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/17/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/25/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/25/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/25/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/25/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/02/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/02/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/02/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/22/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/22/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/22/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 04/28/2004
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/05/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/20/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/20/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/20/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/20/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/17/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/20/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/22/2004