Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/21/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 11/21/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/21/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/21/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/21/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/21/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/09/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/18/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/18/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/18/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/18/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/18/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/18/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/02/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/02/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/02/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/08/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/08/2004