Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 11/05/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 11/05/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/05/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/27/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/10/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/10/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/24/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/22/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/22/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/22/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/23/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/06/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/17/2004