Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 11/06/2003
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 11/06/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 11/06/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/18/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/18/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/18/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/18/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 11/21/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/21/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/08/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/27/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 01/27/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/03/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/11/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/16/2004