Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/18/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 11/18/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 12/08/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/27/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 01/27/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/27/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/27/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/27/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/04/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/10/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/10/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/10/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/02/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/25/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/25/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/28/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 04/28/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/28/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/06/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/06/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/06/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/12/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/12/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/17/2004