There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

SUTA Dumping Prevention Act of 2004

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SUTA Dumping Prevention Act of 2004

Short Titles as Introduced

SUTA Dumping Prevention Act of 2003

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

SUTA Dumping Prevention Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles III and IV of the Social Security Act to improve the administration of unemployment taxes and benefits.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
08/09/2004Became Public Law No: 108-295. (TXT | PDF)
08/09/2004Signed by President.
07/28/2004Presented to President.
07/22/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8804)
07/14/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5669-5670)
11/06/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
08/09/2004Became Public Law No: 108-295. (TXT | PDF)
08/09/2004Signed by President.
07/28/2004HousePresented to President.
07/23/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/22/2004SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8804)
07/15/2004SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/14/2004-11:58amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/14/2004-11:58amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5669-5670)
07/14/2004-11:36amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3463.
07/14/2004-11:36amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5669-5672)
07/14/2004-11:34amHouseMr. Herger moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/10/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
11/06/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
11/06/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means11/06/2003 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources11/10/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3463. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-295 (08/09/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

SUTA Dumping Prevention Act of 2004 - Amends the Social Security Act (SSA) with respect to administration of unemployment taxes and benefits.

Revises SSA title III (Grants to States for Unemployment Compensation Administration) to require State unemployment compensation laws, as a condition of State eligibility for such grants, to provide for transfer of unemployment experience upon transfer or acquisition of a business. Directs the Secretary of Labor to study and report to Congress on State implementation of such requirement.

Revises SSA title IV part D (Child Support and Establishment of Paternity) to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to disclose information on individuals and their employers in the National Directory of New Hires to a State agency that, for purposes of administering a Federal or State unemployment compensation law, transmits such individuals' names and social security account numbers to the Secretary. Requires such disclosure only to the extent that it would not interfere with effective operation of the part D program.