Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 11/06/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/17/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 11/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/08/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/20/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/20/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/20/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/20/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/20/2004
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/20/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/21/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/21/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 01/21/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 01/27/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/11/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 02/24/2004
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/24/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/03/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/03/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/16/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/17/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/25/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/31/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/20/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/11/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/11/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/12/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/17/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/08/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/08/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew