There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Prisoner of War Benefits Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide improved benefits for veterans who are former prisoners of war.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/27/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
05/19/2004Provision incorporated. See H. R. 4175, Section 4.
04/29/2004Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits
02/20/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/27/2003Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/27/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/05/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/26/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/19/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/19/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/19/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/19/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/19/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/20/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 04/02/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/09/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/09/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/10/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/01/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/09/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/22/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/05/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/22/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/09/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/25/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/28/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/09/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/23/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/24/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/25/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/01/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/01/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/02/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/21/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/21/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/21/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/22/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/22/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/27/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/05/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/14/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/16/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/27/2003 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits02/20/2003 Referred to
04/29/2004 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.348. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/27/2003)

Prisoner of War Benefits Act of 2003 - Amends Federal veterans' benefits provisions with respect to former prisoners of war to repeal the currently required: (1) 30-day minimum period of internment prior to the presumption of service connection for certain listed diseases, for purposes of the payment of veterans' disability compensation; and (2) 90-day minimum period of internment prior to eligibility for dental care furnished through the Department of Veterans Affairs. Adds the following to the listed diseases under (1), above: heart disease, stroke, liver disease, diabetes (type 2), and osteoporosis. Requires: (1) such presumption also with respect to any disease that the Secretary of Veterans Affairs determines warrants such presumption by reason of having a positive association with the experience of being a prisoner of war; and (2) the Secretary to make such a determination within 60 days after a recommendation from the Advisory Committee on Former Prisoners of War that such presumption be established for a non-listed disease.