Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/05/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/26/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/19/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/19/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/19/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/19/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/19/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/20/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 04/02/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/09/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/09/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/10/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/01/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/09/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/22/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/05/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/22/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/09/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/25/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/28/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/09/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/23/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/24/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/25/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/01/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/01/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/02/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/21/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/21/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/21/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/22/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/22/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/27/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/05/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/14/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/16/2004