Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 12/08/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/08/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 01/27/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 01/27/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/27/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 01/27/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/03/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/03/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/10/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/10/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/25/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/02/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/10/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/25/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/31/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/21/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/17/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/18/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/18/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/20/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 05/20/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/20/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/01/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/01/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/03/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/13/2004