Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/26/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/03/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/10/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/18/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/18/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/15/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/15/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/25/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/25/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/19/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/08/2004