Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 11/07/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 11/07/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 11/07/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 11/07/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/25/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/25/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/25/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/25/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/21/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/27/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/03/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/19/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/09/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/13/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/17/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/18/2004