Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 11/17/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/18/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/19/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 11/19/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/19/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/21/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/08/2003