Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/18/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 11/18/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 12/08/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/28/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/03/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/03/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/01/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/03/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/03/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/03/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/10/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/11/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/11/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/11/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/11/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/17/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/17/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/17/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/29/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/20/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/02/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/22/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew