Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 12/08/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/08/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 12/08/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/08/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/28/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 01/28/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/28/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/28/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/28/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/03/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/25/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/25/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/25/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/02/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/10/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/21/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/27/2004