Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/16/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/20/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/21/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/21/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/06/2004