Refine your search

15 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
07/22/2004 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
07/20/2004 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
07/07/2004 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
06/23/2004 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
06/09/2004 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
05/19/2004 To conference: Senate insisted on its amendment, requested a conference.
05/19/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 5/21/2004 S6112)
04/02/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 357 - 65 (Roll no. 114).
03/29/2004 Committee on Science discharged.
03/29/2004 Committee on Resources discharged.
03/29/2004 Committee on Judiciary discharged.
03/29/2004 Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
03/29/2004 Committee on Education and the Workforce discharged.
03/29/2004 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on 108-452, Part I.
11/20/2003 Introduced in House