Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 11/20/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/20/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/20/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/21/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/21/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/21/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/08/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/20/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/20/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 01/20/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 01/20/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/20/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/21/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/21/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 01/21/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/21/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/21/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/23/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/23/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/23/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 01/23/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/23/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 01/23/2004
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 01/23/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/23/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/23/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/28/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/28/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/28/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/28/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/28/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 01/28/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/28/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/28/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/28/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/03/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/03/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/03/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/04/2004
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/04/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/04/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/06/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/06/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/10/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/10/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/24/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/02/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/02/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/04/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/16/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/17/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/18/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/24/2004