Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/08/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/08/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/31/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/31/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/02/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/02/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/28/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/13/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/18/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/18/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 06/01/2004
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/01/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/01/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/02/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/02/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/08/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/24/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/24/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/24/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/24/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/07/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/07/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/07/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/09/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/14/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/14/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/14/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/15/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/21/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/08/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/14/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/22/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/22/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/22/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/22/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/24/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/29/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/04/2004
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/04/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/04/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/08/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/08/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/16/2004