Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 11/20/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/10/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/30/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/22/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/22/2004