Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/24/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/24/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/24/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/25/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/25/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/14/2004