Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 01/21/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/21/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 01/27/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 01/27/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/04/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/04/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/04/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/04/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/04/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/11/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/11/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/11/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/11/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/11/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/02/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/02/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/02/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/02/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/02/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/02/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/02/2004
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 03/02/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/03/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/03/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/09/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 03/09/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/10/2004
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/10/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/10/2004
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/17/2004
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/17/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/17/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/17/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/25/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/25/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 03/25/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/25/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/25/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/31/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/31/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/31/2004
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/31/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/31/2004
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/31/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/31/2004
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/31/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/02/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/02/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/02/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/02/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/02/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 04/20/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/20/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/20/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/20/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/22/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/28/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/19/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/19/2004
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/19/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/19/2004
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/01/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/01/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/03/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/08/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/08/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/09/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/09/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/15/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/15/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/15/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/15/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/23/2004
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/24/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/07/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/07/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/07/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/07/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/07/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/14/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/15/2004