Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 11/21/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/21/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 11/21/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/21/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/25/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/25/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/25/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/20/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/03/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/10/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/02/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/11/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/08/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/22/2004