Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/08/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 01/28/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/10/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/10/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/11/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/02/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/02/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/24/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/31/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/31/2004