Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 02/10/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/11/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/25/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 06/21/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 11/16/2004