Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/05/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/05/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/13/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/13/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 03/13/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/13/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/13/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/13/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/13/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/13/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/13/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/17/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/17/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 03/18/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/18/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/24/2003