Refine your search

8 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/23/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-482. (TXT | PDF)
12/23/2004 Signed by President.
12/16/2004 Presented to President.
12/08/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/08/2004 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S12028-12029)
09/21/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7264-7265)
07/13/2004 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 108-600.
11/21/2003 Introduced in House