Committees: H.R.3632 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary11/21/2003 Referred to
06/23/2004 Markup by
07/13/2004 Reported by H. Rept. 108-600
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, the Internet, and Intellectual Property12/10/2003 Referred to
02/12/2004 Hearings by
03/31/2004 Markup by
03/31/2004 Reported by
Senate Judiciary09/22/2004 Referred to
12/08/2004 Discharged from