Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 11/21/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/12/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/12/2004
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/12/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/03/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/08/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/14/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/16/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/18/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/21/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/08/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/13/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/13/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/15/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/21/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/21/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/21/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/21/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/23/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/23/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/28/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/29/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/07/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/18/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/18/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/18/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/19/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/07/2004