Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 11/21/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 11/21/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/02/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/10/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/10/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/16/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/17/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/18/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/24/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/01/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/20/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/16/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/16/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/16/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/08/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/08/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/07/2004