Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 01/27/2004
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/27/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/27/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 01/27/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/27/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/27/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/27/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 01/27/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/27/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/27/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 01/27/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/27/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/27/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 01/27/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/27/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 01/27/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 01/27/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 01/27/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/27/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/27/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 01/27/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/27/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 01/27/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/27/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/27/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/27/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/27/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/27/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/27/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/03/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 02/03/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/26/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/26/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/26/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/26/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/26/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 02/26/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/26/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/26/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/26/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/26/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/26/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/26/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/26/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/26/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/26/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/26/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/26/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/26/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/02/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/03/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/09/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/09/2004