Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 12/08/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/21/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/21/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/21/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/21/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/21/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/21/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/21/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/21/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/21/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/21/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/21/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/21/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 01/28/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/28/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/28/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/28/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/06/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/24/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/24/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/24/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/26/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/10/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/16/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/23/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/30/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/15/2004