Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/10/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/27/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/23/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/07/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/08/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/08/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/08/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/08/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/08/2004