Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 12/08/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/08/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/21/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/21/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/21/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/21/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/21/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/21/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/04/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/04/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/04/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/25/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/25/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/25/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/25/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/10/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/10/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/31/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/31/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/21/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/04/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/04/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/04/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/17/2004
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/17/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/02/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/03/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/03/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/09/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/17/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/24/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/07/2004