Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/21/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/21/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/21/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/21/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/21/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 01/21/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 01/21/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/21/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 01/28/2004
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 01/28/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 01/28/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 01/28/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/28/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/28/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 01/28/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 01/28/2004
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/03/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/03/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 02/11/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/04/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/04/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/04/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/07/2004